California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 2, 2014
Bill September 12, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013