|
04/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3073.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3637.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|