LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB579
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB579
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB579
Compare Versions
AB579 Chaptered April 28, 2014
AB579 Enrolled April 10, 2014
AB579 Amended January 15, 2014
AB579 Amended January 6, 2014
AB579 Amended April 11, 2013
AB579 Amended March 14, 2013
AB579 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB579 Chaptered April 28, 2014
AB579 Enrolled April 10, 2014
AB579 Amended January 15, 2014
AB579 Amended January 6, 2014
AB579 Amended April 11, 2013
AB579 Amended March 14, 2013
AB579 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare