California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB579 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2014

Chaptered

Bill April 28, 2014

Amended

Bill January 15, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013