|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2921.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2108.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1748.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|