California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2013

Amended

Bill August 26, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013