LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB593
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB593
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB593
Compare Versions
AB593 Chaptered October 3, 2013
AB593 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB593 Amended August 26, 2013
AB593 Amended May 24, 2013
AB593 Amended May 6, 2013
AB593 Amended April 2, 2013
AB593 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB593 Chaptered October 3, 2013
AB593 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB593 Amended August 26, 2013
AB593 Amended May 24, 2013
AB593 Amended May 6, 2013
AB593 Amended April 2, 2013
AB593 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare