|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2013
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3106.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2239.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1477.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|