LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB610
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB610
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB610
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 20, 2013
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 16, 2013
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 10, 2013
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 3, 2013
Compare
Bill
June 25, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 16, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 9, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 4, 2013
Compare
Bill
March 19, 2013
Compare