LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB610
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB610
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB610
Compare Versions
AB610 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB610 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB610 Amended September 3, 2013
AB610 Amended June 25, 2013
AB610 Amended April 16, 2013
AB610 Amended April 9, 2013
AB610 Amended April 4, 2013
AB610 Amended March 19, 2013
AB610 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB610 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB610 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB610 Amended September 3, 2013
AB610 Amended June 25, 2013
AB610 Amended April 16, 2013
AB610 Amended April 9, 2013
AB610 Amended April 4, 2013
AB610 Amended March 19, 2013
AB610 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare