|
08/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 136, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2467.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1697.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|