LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB631
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB631
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB631
Compare Versions
AB631 Chaptered August 26, 2013
AB631 Enrolled August 13, 2013
AB631 Amended July 2, 2013
AB631 Amended May 13, 2013
AB631 Amended April 30, 2013
AB631 Amended April 10, 2013
AB631 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB631 Chaptered August 26, 2013
AB631 Enrolled August 13, 2013
AB631 Amended July 2, 2013
AB631 Amended May 13, 2013
AB631 Amended April 30, 2013
AB631 Amended April 10, 2013
AB631 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare