California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB631 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2013

Amended

Bill July 2, 2013
Bill May 13, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013