Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2328.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1475.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|