LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB64
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB64
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB64
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 7, 2013
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 18, 2013
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 4, 2013
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 27, 2013
Compare
Bill
July 11, 2013
Compare
Bill
July 1, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 8, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 17, 2013
Compare
Bill
February 7, 2013
Compare