LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB64
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB64
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB64
Compare Versions
AB64 Chaptered October 4, 2013
AB64 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB64 Amended August 27, 2013
AB64 Amended July 11, 2013
AB64 Amended July 1, 2013
AB64 Amended May 8, 2013
AB64 Amended April 17, 2013
AB64 Amended February 7, 2013
AB64 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB64 Chaptered October 4, 2013
AB64 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB64 Amended August 27, 2013
AB64 Amended July 11, 2013
AB64 Amended July 1, 2013
AB64 Amended May 8, 2013
AB64 Amended April 17, 2013
AB64 Amended February 7, 2013
AB64 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare