California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB64 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/11/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 64AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 11, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 8, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 17, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 7, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Donnelly and Linder JANUARY 7, 2013 An act to add Section 35400.6 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 64, as amended, Donnelly. Vehicles: fifth-wheel travel trailers. (1) Existing law prohibits a vehicle from exceeding 40 feet in length. Existing law exempts from this prohibition specified types of vehicles, including, but not limited to, an articulated bus or articulated trolley coach that does not exceed a length of 60 feet, and a motortruck used solely as a cotton module mover that does not exceed 48 feet in length. A violation of the Vehicle Code is a crime. This bill would additionally exempt from this prohibition a 5th-wheel travel trailer that does not exceed 48 feet in length from the foremost point of the trailer to the rear extremity of the trailer, and that does not exceed 40 feet in length from the kingpin to the  centerline of the  rearmost axle. The bill would require a manufacturer of a 5th-wheel travel trailer that meets this exemption to include in the delivery documents provided to a dealer the overall length of the 5th-wheel travel trailer. The bill would permit a dealer to reject acceptance of the 5th-wheel travel trailer if this documentation is not provided. By creating a new crime, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. (2) The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 35400.6 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 35400.6. (a) Subdivision (a) of Section 35400 does not apply to a fifth-wheel travel trailer that does not exceed 48 feet in length from the foremost point of the trailer to the rear extremity of the trailer, and that does not exceed 40 feet in length from the kingpin to the  centerline of the  rearmost axle. (b) A manufacturer of a fifth-wheel travel trailer described by subdivision (a) shall include in the delivery documents provided to a dealer the overall length of the fifth-wheel travel trailer. The dealer may reject acceptance of the fifth-wheel travel trailer if this documentation is not provided. SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.