Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|