LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB640
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB640
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB640
Compare Versions
AB640 Amended July 2, 2014
AB640 Amended June 19, 2014
AB640 Amended August 28, 2013
AB640 Amended August 27, 2013
AB640 Amended July 3, 2013
AB640 Amended June 20, 2013
AB640 Amended March 19, 2013
AB640 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB640 Amended July 2, 2014
AB640 Amended June 19, 2014
AB640 Amended August 28, 2013
AB640 Amended August 27, 2013
AB640 Amended July 3, 2013
AB640 Amended June 20, 2013
AB640 Amended March 19, 2013
AB640 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare