California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill August 28, 2013
Bill August 27, 2013
Bill July 3, 2013
Bill June 20, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013