|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2576.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1857.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1007.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|