California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB65 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill March 20, 2013
Bill February 25, 2013
Bill February 20, 2013
Bill January 30, 2013