LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB65
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB65
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB65
Compare Versions
AB65 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB65 Enrolled August 23, 2013
AB65 Amended June 25, 2013
AB65 Amended May 8, 2013
AB65 Amended March 20, 2013
AB65 Amended February 25, 2013
AB65 Amended February 20, 2013
AB65 Amended January 30, 2013
AB65 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB65 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB65 Enrolled August 23, 2013
AB65 Amended June 25, 2013
AB65 Amended May 8, 2013
AB65 Amended March 20, 2013
AB65 Amended February 25, 2013
AB65 Amended February 20, 2013
AB65 Amended January 30, 2013
AB65 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare