|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 578, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3071.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1660.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|