LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB66
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB66
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB66
Compare Versions
AB66 Chaptered October 5, 2013
AB66 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB66 Amended September 3, 2013
AB66 Amended August 12, 2013
AB66 Amended June 25, 2013
AB66 Amended June 11, 2013
AB66 Amended May 8, 2013
AB66 Amended March 14, 2013
AB66 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB66 Chaptered October 5, 2013
AB66 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB66 Amended September 3, 2013
AB66 Amended August 12, 2013
AB66 Amended June 25, 2013
AB66 Amended June 11, 2013
AB66 Amended May 8, 2013
AB66 Amended March 14, 2013
AB66 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare