California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB66 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill June 11, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013