Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2335.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1122.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|