California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB662 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 13, 2013
Bill June 11, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013