LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB662
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB662
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB662
Compare Versions
AB662 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB662 Amended September 6, 2013
AB662 Amended September 3, 2013
AB662 Amended August 13, 2013
AB662 Amended June 11, 2013
AB662 Amended May 24, 2013
AB662 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB662 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB662 Amended September 6, 2013
AB662 Amended September 3, 2013
AB662 Amended August 13, 2013
AB662 Amended June 11, 2013
AB662 Amended May 24, 2013
AB662 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare