|
08/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2286.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1607.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1514.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|