California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB727 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 10, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2013

Amended

Bill June 18, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013