LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB727
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB727
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB727
Compare Versions
AB727 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB727 Enrolled July 10, 2013
AB727 Amended June 18, 2013
AB727 Amended April 30, 2013
AB727 Amended March 21, 2013
AB727 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB727 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB727 Enrolled July 10, 2013
AB727 Amended June 18, 2013
AB727 Amended April 30, 2013
AB727 Amended March 21, 2013
AB727 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare