|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6626.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6550.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4418.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 1757.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|