LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB922
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB922
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB922
Compare Versions
AB922 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB922 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB922 Amended June 25, 2014
AB922 Amended May 29, 2014
AB922 Amended July 3, 2013
AB922 Amended May 24, 2013
AB922 Amended May 8, 2013
AB922 Amended April 24, 2013
AB922 Amended April 16, 2013
AB922 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB922 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB922 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB922 Amended June 25, 2014
AB922 Amended May 29, 2014
AB922 Amended July 3, 2013
AB922 Amended May 24, 2013
AB922 Amended May 8, 2013
AB922 Amended April 24, 2013
AB922 Amended April 16, 2013
AB922 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare