California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 29, 2014
Bill July 3, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013