|
10/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 771, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3331.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2404.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1693.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|