LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB952
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB952
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB952
Compare Versions
AB952 Chaptered October 12, 2013
AB952 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB952 Amended June 26, 2013
AB952 Amended May 2, 2013
AB952 Amended March 18, 2013
AB952 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB952 Chaptered October 12, 2013
AB952 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB952 Amended June 26, 2013
AB952 Amended May 2, 2013
AB952 Amended March 18, 2013
AB952 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare