California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2013

Amended

Bill June 26, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013