Assembly | 09/11/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4982.) Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4994.) | ||
Senate | 08/26/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 6281.) | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2014 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2014 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2014 | Introduced. To print. |