LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR50
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR50
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR50
Compare Versions
AJR50 Chaptered September 11, 2014
AJR50 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AJR50 Amended August 21, 2014
AJR50 Amended August 20, 2014
AJR50 Introduced August 5, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AJR50 Chaptered September 11, 2014
AJR50 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AJR50 Amended August 21, 2014
AJR50 Amended August 20, 2014
AJR50 Introduced August 5, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare