California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR50 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 5, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 20, 2014