08/22/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 249, Statutes of 2014. | |||
08/22/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/13/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4398.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 33. Page 5743.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3357.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3094.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |