LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1038
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1038
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1038
Compare Versions
SB1038 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB1038 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SB1038 Amended June 4, 2014
SB1038 Amended March 28, 2014
SB1038 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1038 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB1038 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SB1038 Amended June 4, 2014
SB1038 Amended March 28, 2014
SB1038 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare