California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1038 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 4, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014