|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6403.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6154.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 2662.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 388.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|