LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB113
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB113
Compare Versions
SB113 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB113 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB113 Amended August 19, 2014
SB113 Amended July 1, 2014
SB113 Amended June 17, 2014
SB113 Amended January 6, 2014
SB113 Introduced January 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB113 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB113 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB113 Amended August 19, 2014
SB113 Amended July 1, 2014
SB113 Amended June 17, 2014
SB113 Amended January 6, 2014
SB113 Introduced January 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare