California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014