|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 346, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4988.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 28). Read second time. Amended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6700.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6701.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6644.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 6317.) Read third time and amended. (Page 6341.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6166.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3603.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3710.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3215.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|