LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1168
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1168
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1168
Compare Versions
SB1168 Chaptered September 16, 2014
SB1168 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 29, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 19, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 6, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1168 Amended June 17, 2014
SB1168 Amended April 23, 2014
SB1168 Amended April 10, 2014
SB1168 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1168 Chaptered September 16, 2014
SB1168 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 29, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 19, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 6, 2014
SB1168 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1168 Amended June 17, 2014
SB1168 Amended April 23, 2014
SB1168 Amended April 10, 2014
SB1168 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare