California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 29, 2014
Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 6, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill April 23, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014